House | 03/31/2022 | File Number 236 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | House Calendar Number 200 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |