House | 05/02/2022 | House Recommitted to Judiciary | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | File Number 552 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | House Calendar Number 402 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/11/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |