House | 05/24/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/13/2022 | Public Act 22-110 | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 526 | ||
House | 04/30/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | File Number 595 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | House Calendar Number 465 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | Public Hearing 03/21 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |