House | 04/25/2022 | File Number 606 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | House Calendar Number 470 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Favorable Report, House Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2022 | House Favorable | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Filed with House Clerks 04/01 |