LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00001
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00001
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2022 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00001
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 26, 2022
Bill
February 8, 2022
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 13, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 29, 2022
Bill
April 26, 2022
Compare
Analysis
April 26, 2022
Bill
March 30, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 10, 2022
Compare