Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Public Act 22-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5959
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 5937
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
House Calendar Number 486
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 5370
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 5470
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 5369
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 5461
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 5450
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 5426
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5435
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5431
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
File Number 406
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 278
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|