House
|
05/26/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Public Act 22-146
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2022
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Calendar Number 563
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6537
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
File Number 642
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 457
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|