Senate | 05/10/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Public Act 22-5 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | House Calendar Number 487 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | File Number 305 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 224 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |