Researcher: MF Page 1 4/5/22 OLR Bill Analysis SB 10 AN ACT CONCERNING CLIMATE CHANGE MITIGATION. SUMMARY This bill requires the state to eliminate greenhouse gas emissions from electricity supplied to electric customers in the state by January 1, 2040. The bill establishes this requirement as an emissions reduction goal under the state’s Global Warming Solutions Act (see BACKGROUND). By law and under the bill, the Global Warming Solutions Act requires the state to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from all sources to a level at least (1) 10% below the level emitted in 1990 by January 1, 2020; (2) 45% below the level emitted in 2001 by January 1, 2030; and (3) 80% below the level emitted in 2001 by January 1, 2050. The bill additionally requires the state to reduce greenhouse gas emissions from electricity supplied to electric customers in the state to zero percent by January 1, 2040. By law, the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection (DEEP) commissioner determines emission levels. Greenhouse gas includes any chemical or physical substance emitted into the air that the DEEP commissioner reasonably anticipates will cause or contribute to climate change (e.g., carbon dioxide, methane, nitrous oxide, hydrofluorocarbons, perfluorocarbons, and sulfur hexafluoride). EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 BACKGROUND Global Warming Solutions Act Reporting Requirements By law, state agencies on the governor’s Steering Committee on Climate Change must report biannually to the Office of Policy and Management (OPM) secretary and the DEEP commissioner on, among 2022SB-00010-R000305-BA.DOCX Researcher: MF Page 2 4/5/22 other things, policies and regulations that the agencies can adopt in the near future to reduce greenhouse gas emissions in accordance with the Global Warming Solutions Act. By law, every three years, the DEEP commissioner, in consultation with OPM and the governor’s Steering Committee on Climate Change must report to the Energy and Technology, Environment, and Transportation committees on quantifiable emissions reductions achieved under these provisions. Among other things, the report must include a schedule of proposed regulations, policies, and strategies designed to achieve the act’s emissions reduction requirements. COMMITTEE ACTION Energy and Technology Committee Joint Favorable Yea 21 Nay 5 (03/22/2022)