Senate | 04/11/2022 | Motion Failed (SF) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | File Number 64 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 78 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |