Senate | 03/23/2022 | File Number 84 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 90 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |