Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00089 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/23/2022

                     
 
Researcher: JO 	Page 1 	3/23/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 89  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SURGICAL SMOKE.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires each licensed hospital and outpatient surgical 
facility, by January 1, 2023, to develop a policy for using a surgical 
smoke evacuation system to prevent exposure to surgical smoke. By 
October 1, 2023, these facilities must implement the policy and, upon 
request, provide a copy to the Department of Public Health.  
Under the bill, “surgical smoke” is the by-product of using an energy-
generating device during surgery, such as surgical or smoke plume, 
bioaerosols, laser-generated airborne contaminants, or lung-damaging 
dust. But the term excludes by-products produced during 
gastroenterological or ophthalmic procedures which are not emitted 
into the operating room during surgery.  
A “surgical smoke evacuation system” is a system, such as a smoke 
or laser plume evacuator or local exhaust ventilator, that captures and 
neutralizes surgical smoke (1) at the smoke’s site of origin and (2) before 
the smoke contacts the eyes or respiratory tract of anyone in an 
operating room during surgery. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2022 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 31 Nay 0 (03/11/2022)