House
|
05/27/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Public Act 22-123
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6384
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2022
|
House Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5776
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
File Number 254
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 209
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|