Senate | 04/19/2022 | File Number 517 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 380 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Public Hearing 03/01 |