Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 21, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Analysis April 6, 2022