Senate | 03/31/2022 | File Number 240 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 191 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |