Senate | 05/27/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Public Act 22-119 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | House Calendar Number 560 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | File Number 22 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 46 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |