Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00135 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/16/2022

                        
 
 
LCO No. 1050  	1 of 4 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 135  
February Session, 2022 
LCO No. 1050 
 
 
Referred to Committee on PUBLIC SAFETY AND SECURITY  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(PS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ACCREDITATION STANDARDS FOR LAW 
ENFORCEMENT UNITS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 7-294ee of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 
(a) [Until December 31, 2024, the] The Police Officer Standards and 3 
Training Council, established under section 7-294b, and the 4 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection or the 5 
commissioner's designee, shall jointly develop, adopt and revise, as 6 
necessary, minimum standards and practices for the administration, 7 
[and] management and operation of law enforcement units, as defined 8 
in section 7-294a. Such minimum standards and practices shall be based 9 
upon standards established by the International Association of Chiefs of 10 
Police and the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 11 
Agencies, Inc., and shall include, but need not be limited to, standards 12 
and practices regarding bias-based policing, use of force, response to 13 
crimes of family violence, use of body-worn recording equipment, 14 
complaints that allege misconduct by police officers, use of electronic 15  Raised Bill No.  135 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1050   	2 of 4 
 
defense weapons, eyewitness identification procedures, notifications in 16 
death and related events and pursuits by police officers and compliance 17 
with the guidance issued by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of 18 
subsection (g) of section 7-294d regarding reporting procedures to be 19 
followed by chief law enforcement officers for certificate suspension, 20 
cancellation or revocation. Not later than January 1, 2023, the council 21 
shall, within available appropriations, divide the minimum standards 22 
and practices into three state-accreditation tiers, to be known as tier one, 23 
tier two and tier three. Tier one shall consist of minimum standards and 24 
practices designed to protect law enforcement units from liability, 25 
enhance the delivery of services and improve public confidence in law 26 
enforcement units. Tier two shall consist of minimum standards and 27 
practices for the administration, management and operation of law 28 
enforcement units. Tier three shall consist of higher minimum standards 29 
and practices for the administration, management and operation of law 30 
enforcement units. The council shall post [such] the minimum standards 31 
and practices of each tier on the council's Internet web site and 32 
disseminate [such] the minimum standards and practices of each tier to 33 
law enforcement units. The council and commissioner or the 34 
commissioner's designee shall jointly develop a process to review a law 35 
enforcement unit's compliance with [such] the minimum standards and 36 
practices of each tier and issue a certificate of compliance with [law 37 
enforcement] the minimum standards and practices of tier one, tier two 38 
or tier three, as the case may be, to a law enforcement unit that meets or 39 
exceeds [such] the minimum standards and practices of such tier. 40 
(b) On and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, [2024] 2022, 41 
each law enforcement unit shall adopt and maintain (1) the minimum 42 
standards and practices developed by the council pursuant to 43 
subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation 44 
standards developed by the council or the Commission on Accreditation 45 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 46 
(c) On and after January 1, 2023, and until December 31, 2023, each 47 
law enforcement unit shall meet (1) the requirements for state-48 
accreditation tier one developed by the council pursuant to subsection 49  Raised Bill No.  135 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1050   	3 of 4 
 
(a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation standards 50 
developed by the council or the Commission on Accreditation for Law 51 
Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 52 
(d) On and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2025, each 53 
law enforcement unit shall meet (1) the requirements for state-54 
accreditation tiers one and two developed by the council pursuant to 55 
subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation 56 
standards developed by the council or the Commission on Accreditation 57 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 58 
[(c)] (e) On and after January 1, [2025] 2026, each law enforcement 59 
unit shall [obtain and maintain accreditation] meet (1) the requirements 60 
for state-accreditation tiers one, two and three developed by the council 61 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of 62 
accreditation standards developed by the Commission on Accreditation 63 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 64 
(f) If a law enforcement unit fails to obtain or maintain [such 65 
accreditation] the appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers or the 66 
higher level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission 67 
on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., as required by the 68 
provisions of subsections (b) to (e), inclusive, of this section, the council 69 
shall work with the law enforcement unit to obtain and maintain such 70 
state-accreditation tier or tiers or accreditation standards. 71 
(g) If a law enforcement unit fails to comply with the guidance issued 72 
by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of section 7-73 
294d regarding reporting procedures to be followed by chief law 74 
enforcement officers for certificate suspension, cancellation or 75 
revocation, the council may revoke the certificate of compliance with the 76 
appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers, as the case may be, issued 77 
pursuant to this section. 78 
[(d)] (h) No civil action may be brought against a law enforcement 79 
unit for damages arising from the failure of the law enforcement unit to 80 
(1) adopt and maintain such minimum standards and practices or a 81  Raised Bill No.  135 
 
 
 
LCO No. 1050   	4 of 4 
 
higher level of accreditation standards pursuant to subsection (b) of this 82 
section, or (2) obtain and maintain the appropriate state-accreditation 83 
tier or tiers or accreditation by the Commission on Accreditation for 84 
Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., [pursuant to subsection (c) of this 85 
section] as required by subsections (c) to (e), inclusive, of this section. 86 
Sec. 2. Subdivision (22) of subsection (a) of section 7-294d of the 2022 87 
supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is 88 
substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 89 
(22) (A) [Until December 31, 2024, to] To develop, adopt and revise, 90 
as necessary, comprehensive accreditation standards, and designation 91 
of such standards as state-accreditation tiers one, two and three, for the 92 
administration and management of law enforcement units, to grant 93 
accreditation to those law enforcement units that demonstrate their 94 
compliance with such standards and, at the request and expense of any 95 
law enforcement unit, to conduct such surveys as may be necessary to 96 
determine such unit's compliance with such standards; and (B) on and 97 
after January 1, [2025,] 2023 to work with any law enforcement unit that 98 
has failed to obtain or maintain accreditation [from] at the appropriate 99 
tier or tiers or a higher level of accreditation standards developed by the 100 
council or the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 101 
Agencies, Inc., pursuant to section 7-294ee, as amended by this act; 102 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage 7-294ee 
Sec. 2 from passage 7-294d(a)(22) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To revise the requirements regarding the accreditation of law 
enforcement units. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except 
that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not 
underlined.]