Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00135 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/16/2022

                     
 
 
Substitute Senate Bill No. 135 
 
Public Act No. 22-119 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING ACCREDITATION STANDARDS FOR LAW 
ENFORCEMENT UNITS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Section 7-294ee of the general statutes is repealed and the 
following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 
(a) [Until December 31, 2024, the] The Police Officer Standards and 
Training Council, established under section 7-294b, and the 
Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection or the 
commissioner's designee, shall jointly develop, adopt and revise, as 
necessary, minimum standards and practices for the administration, 
[and] management and operation of law enforcement units, as defined 
in section 7-294a. Such minimum standards and practices shall be based 
upon standards established by the International Association of Chiefs of 
Police and the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 
Agencies, Inc., and shall include, but need not be limited to, standards 
and practices regarding bias-based policing, use of force, response to 
crimes of family violence, use of body-worn recording equipment, 
complaints that allege misconduct by police officers, use of electronic 
defense weapons, eyewitness identification procedures, notifications in 
death and related events and pursuits by police officers and compliance 
with the guidance issued by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of  Substitute Senate Bill No. 135 
 
Public Act No. 22-119 	2 of 4 
 
subsection (g) of section 7-294d regarding reporting procedures to be 
followed by chief law enforcement officers for certificate suspension, 
cancellation or revocation. Not later than January 1, 2023, the council 
shall, within available appropriations, divide the minimum standards 
and practices into three state-accreditation tiers, to be known as tier one, 
tier two and tier three. Tier one shall consist of minimum standards and 
practices designed to protect law enforcement units from liability, 
enhance the delivery of services and improve public confidence in law 
enforcement units. Tier two shall consist of minimum standards and 
practices for the administration, management and operation of law 
enforcement units. Tier three shall consist of higher minimum standards 
and practices for the administration, management and operation of law 
enforcement units. The council shall post [such] the minimum standards 
and practices of each tier on the council's Internet web site and 
disseminate [such] the minimum standards and practices of each tier to 
law enforcement units. The council and commissioner or the 
commissioner's designee shall jointly develop a process to review a law 
enforcement unit's compliance with [such] the minimum standards and 
practices of each tier and issue a certificate of compliance with [law 
enforcement] the minimum standards and practices of tier one, tier two 
or tier three, as the case may be, to a law enforcement unit that meets or 
exceeds [such] the minimum standards and practices of such tier. 
(b) On and after January 1, 2019, and until December 31, [2024] 2022, 
each law enforcement unit shall adopt and maintain (1) the minimum 
standards and practices developed by the council pursuant to 
subsection (a) of this section, or (2) a higher level of accreditation 
standards developed by the council or the Commission on Accreditation 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 
(c) On and after January 1, 2023, and until December 31, 2023, each 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting the 
requirements for state-accreditation tier one developed by the council  Substitute Senate Bill No. 135 
 
Public Act No. 22-119 	3 of 4 
 
pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher level of 
accreditation standards developed by the Commission on Accreditation 
for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 
(d) On and after January 1, 2024, and until December 31, 2025, each 
law enforcement unit shall (1) be certified, at a minimum, as meeting the 
requirements for state-accreditation tiers one and two developed by the 
council pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or (2) meet a higher 
level of accreditation standards developed by the Commission on 
Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 
[(c)] (e) On and after January 1, [2025] 2026, each law enforcement 
unit shall [obtain and maintain accreditation] (1) be certified as meeting 
the requirements for state-accreditation tiers one, two and three 
developed by the council pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, or 
(2) meet a higher level of accreditation standards developed by the 
Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. 
(f) If a law enforcement unit fails to obtain or maintain [such 
accreditation] the appropriate certification for a state-accreditation tier 
or tiers or the higher level of accreditation standards developed by the 
Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., as 
required by the provisions of subsections (b) to (e), inclusive, of this 
section, the council shall work with the law enforcement unit to obtain 
and maintain such certification or accreditation standards. 
(g) If a law enforcement unit fails to comply with the guidance issued 
by the council pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (g) of section 7-
294d regarding reporting procedures to be followed by chief law 
enforcement officers for certificate suspension, cancellation or 
revocation, the council may revoke the certificate of compliance with the 
appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers, as the case may be, issued 
pursuant to this section.  Substitute Senate Bill No. 135 
 
Public Act No. 22-119 	4 of 4 
 
[(d)] (h) No civil action may be brought against a law enforcement 
unit for damages arising from the failure of the law enforcement unit to 
(1) adopt and maintain such minimum standards and practices or a 
higher level of accreditation standards pursuant to subsection (b) of this 
section, or (2) obtain and maintain the appropriate certificate of 
compliance with the appropriate state-accreditation tier or tiers or 
accreditation by the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement 
Agencies, Inc., [pursuant to subsection (c) of this section] as required by 
subsections (c) to (e), inclusive, of this section. 
Sec. 2. Subdivision (22) of subsection (a) of section 7-294d of the 2022 
supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is 
substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 
(22) (A) [Until December 31, 2024, to] To develop, adopt and revise, 
as necessary, comprehensive accreditation standards, and designation 
of such standards as state-accreditation tiers one, two and three, for the 
administration and management of law enforcement units, to grant 
accreditation to those law enforcement units that demonstrate their 
compliance with such standards and, at the request and expense of any 
law enforcement unit, to conduct such surveys as may be necessary to 
determine such unit's compliance with such standards; and (B) on and 
after January 1, [2025,] 2023 to work with any law enforcement unit that 
has failed to obtain or maintain [accreditation from] its certification of 
compliance with the appropriate tier or tiers or a higher level of 
accreditation standards developed by the council or the Commission on 
Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc., pursuant to section 
7-294ee, as amended by this act;