Senate | 04/04/2022 | File Number 260 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 214 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |