Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 13, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note April 12, 2022
Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 23, 2022
Analysis April 27, 2022
Bill April 6, 2022
Analysis April 6, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2022