Senate | 05/10/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Public Act 22-21 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | House Calendar Number 364 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | File Number 139 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 126 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/10 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |