Senate | 04/26/2022 | File Number 646 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | File Number 159 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 148 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |