Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |