Senate | 04/13/2022 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | File Number 366 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 265 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |