Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Public Act 22-138
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
House Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4569
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
File Number 243
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 194
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|