Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Public Act 22-139
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6489
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House Calendar Number 552
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6291
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
File Number 367
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 266
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|