Senate | 04/14/2022 | House Calendar Number 378 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4640 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4615 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | File Number 249 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 200 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |