Connecticut 2022 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00317 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2022

                     
Researcher: LRH 	Page 1 	4/14/22 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 317 (File 249, as amended by Senate "A" and "B")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING UNEMPLOYMENT FOR STRIKING 
EMPLOYEES.  
 
SUMMARY 
Starting on July 1, 2024, this bill generally makes striking workers 
eligible for unemployment benefits after they have been on strike for 
two consecutive weeks. Under current law, claimants are generally 
ineligible for benefits during any week in which their unemployment is 
due to a labor dispute. The bill lifts this ineligibility after a period of two 
consecutive weeks in which the claimant’s unemployment is due to the 
labor dispute. 
Under existing law, unchanged by the bill, claimants may also qualify 
for benefits during a labor dispute, with no waiting period, if (1) the 
labor dispute is a lockout or (2) the claimant is not participating in the 
labor dispute that caused the unemployment and does not belong to a 
trade, class, or organization of workers who were employed at the 
premises immediately before the dispute started (e.g., non-union 
employees at a business temporarily closed by a strike). 
*Senate Amendment “A” changes the underlying bill’s (File 249) 
effective date from October 1, 2022, to January 1, 2023. 
*Senate Amendment “B” changes the bill’s effective date, as 
amended, from January 1, 2023, to July 1, 2024. 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2024 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Labor and Public Employees Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 9 Nay 4 (03/22/2022)