Senate | 04/27/2022 | House Calendar Number 490 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | File Number 250 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 201 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |