House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Public Act 22-44
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Calendar Number 508
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5804
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
File Number 401
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Calendar Number 283
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|