Senate | 04/19/2022 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | File Number 223 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 179 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2022 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |