Senate | 04/06/2022 | File Number 355 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 253 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |