Senate | 04/11/2022 | File Number 387 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 287 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |