Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note March 31, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 15, 2022
Analysis April 21, 2022
Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 31, 2022
Analysis March 31, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2022