House | 05/03/2022 | House Calendar Number 557 | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6340 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | File Number 477 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 329 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |