Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 22, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis July 21, 2022
Analysis April 28, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022
Analysis April 13, 2022

Chaptered

Bill May 16, 2022