Connecticut 2022 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00449 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/12/2022

                             
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00449-R01-
SB.docx  
1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 449  
February Session, 2022 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE RECRUITMENT AND RETENTION OF 
PHYSICIANS IN THE STATE.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) For the fiscal year ending 1 
June 30, 2023, and each fiscal year thereafter, the Office of Higher 2 
Education, in collaboration with the Department of Public Health, shall 3 
administer, within available appropriations, a physician loan 4 
reimbursement grant program to persons who meet the eligibility 5 
requirements described in subsection (b) of this section. 6 
(b) The program shall provide student loan reimbursement grants to 7 
any physician licensed pursuant to chapter 370 of the general statutes 8 
who (1) graduated from a medical school in the state or completed his 9 
or her medical residency program at a hospital licensed under chapter 10 
368v of the general statutes, and (2) is employed as a physician in the 11 
state. 12 
(c) Any physician who satisfies the eligibility requirements 13 
prescribed in subsection (b) of this section and whose application made 14 
under subsection (d) of this section is accepted by the Office of Higher 15 
Education shall receive a grant for reimbursement of all federal and state 16 
educational loans in an amount equal to twenty per cent of the balance 17 
of such loans per year for each year the physician is employed as a 18  Substitute Bill No. 449 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00449-
R01-SB.docx }   
2 of 3 
 
physician in the state. A physician qualifying under subsection (b) of 19 
this section shall only be reimbursed for loan payments made while 20 
such physician continues to satisfy such eligibility requirements. 21 
(d) Physicians may apply to the Office of Higher Education for grants 22 
under this section at such time and in such manner as the executive 23 
director of the Office of Higher Education prescribes. 24 
(e) Any unexpended funds appropriated for purposes of this section 25 
shall not lapse at the end of the fiscal year but shall be available for 26 
expenditure during the next fiscal year. 27 
Sec. 2. (Effective July 1, 2022) (a) On or before January 1, 2023, the 28 
Commissioner of Public Health shall convene a working group to advise 29 
the commissioner regarding methods to enhance physician recruitment 30 
in the state. The working group shall examine issues that include, but 31 
need not be limited to, (1) recruiting, retaining and compensating 32 
primary care, psychiatric and behavioral health care providers; (2) the 33 
potential effectiveness of student loan forgiveness; (3) barriers to 34 
recruiting and retaining physicians as a result of covenants not to 35 
compete, as defined in section 20-14p of the general statutes; (4) access 36 
to health care providers; (5) the effect, if any, of the health insurance 37 
landscape on limiting health care access; (6) barriers to physician 38 
participation in health care networks; and (7) assistance for graduate 39 
medical education training. 40 
(b) The working group convened pursuant to subsection (a) of this 41 
section shall include, but need not be limited to, the following members: 42 
(1) A representative of a hospital association in the state; (2) a 43 
representative of a medical society in the state; (3) a physician licensed 44 
under chapter 370 of the general statutes with a small group practice; (4) 45 
a physician licensed under chapter 370 of the general statutes with a 46 
multisite group practice; (5) one representative each of at least three 47 
different schools of medicine; (6) a representative of a regional physician 48 
recruiter association; (7) the human resources director of at least one 49 
hospital in the state; (8) a member of a patient advocacy group; and (9) 50  Substitute Bill No. 449 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2022SB-00449-
R01-SB.docx }   
3 of 3 
 
four members of the general public. The working group shall elect 51 
chairpersons from among its members. As used in this subsection, 52 
"small group practice" means a group practice comprised of less than 53 
eight full-time equivalent physicians and "multisite group practice" 54 
means a group practice comprised of over one hundred full-time 55 
equivalent physicians practicing throughout the state. 56 
(c) On or before January 1, 2024, the working group shall report, in 57 
accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 58 
its findings to the commissioner and to the joint standing committee of 59 
the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public 60 
health. 61 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2022 New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2022 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 1(c), "and whose application made under subsection (d) of 
this section is accepted by the Office of Higher Education" was inserted 
before "shall receive" for clarity and consistency. 
 
PH Joint Favorable Subst.