Senate | 04/25/2022 | File Number 622 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Senate Calendar Number 450 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | Public Hearing 03/31 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |