House | 04/25/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | File Number 649 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | New File by Committee on Children | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Children | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | File Number 85 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Calendar Number 77 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |