House | 05/02/2023 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | File Number 87 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Calendar Number 79 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |