House | 04/12/2023 | File Number 531 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | File Number 157 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Calendar Number 123 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |