House | 04/25/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | File Number 158 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Calendar Number 124 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |