House | 03/21/2023 | File Number 133 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Calendar Number 105 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |