House | 04/20/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | File Number 326 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | House Calendar Number 225 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |