House | 03/07/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |