House | 06/26/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Public Act 23-120 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 450 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | File Number 401 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | House Calendar Number 264 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |