House | 04/05/2023 | File Number 451 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | House Calendar Number 288 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |