House | 05/08/2023 | File Number 742 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | House Calendar Number 500 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/23 12:00 PM | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |