House | 04/20/2023 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | File Number 183 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Calendar Number 145 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/23 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/23 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |